Dearborn v. Onin Staffing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richelle Dearborn
Defendant: AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc. and Onin Staffing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00387
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Richelle Dearborn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Phillips, John)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Onin Staffing, LLC. (Barszcz, Matthew)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 7/7/2020 granting #8 Motion for Jerry S. Sallee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Richelle Dearborn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Phillips, John)
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Miles on behalf of AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc. (Miles, Amy)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Jerry S. Sallee to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3126819. by Defendant Onin Staffing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Barszcz, Matthew)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF JOINDER IN CO-DEFENDANTS PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS by AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc. re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Calabrese, Jeffrey)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc.. (Calabrese, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Onin Staffing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Barszcz, Matthew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Onin Staffing, LLC. (Barszcz, Matthew)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Hardin Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by Onin Staffing, LLC from Hardin Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00583. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3114379, filed by Onin Staffing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Removal, #3 Exhibit 2 - Civil Summons & Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice To State Court, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Appearance) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dearborn v. Onin Staffing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Calabrese
Represented By: Amy L. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onin Staffing, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Barszcz
Represented By: Jerry S. Sallee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richelle Dearborn
Represented By: John S. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?