Willis v. Southern Association of the Schools and Colleges et al
Plaintiff: Lynell Willis, Jr.
Defendant: Southern Association of the Schools and Colleges and Pamela Carvey
Case Number: 3:2020cv00392
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF TENDERED SUMMONS by Lynell Willis, Jr. re #4 Notice, #1 Complaint. (SMJ)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lynell Willis, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - re Question 8) (SMJ)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (SMJ)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: no fee/no waiver request. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/8/2020. (SMJ)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SMJ)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pamela Carvey, Southern Association of the Schools and Colleges; filed by Lynell Willis, Jr. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (SMJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. Southern Association of the Schools and Colleges et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Association of the Schools and Colleges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Carvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynell Willis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?