Ice v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Julie Ice
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00421
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 6/19/2020, granting #5 - The time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended by sixty (60) days, to and including August 31, 2020. (KD)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Miles, Derek)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 6/15/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3118852., filed by Julie Ice. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ice v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Derek R. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Ice
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?