Smith v. Ferguson
Petitioner: Robert D. Smith
Respondent: Jessie Ferguson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00430
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number L33064509 by Robert D. Smith. (JLP)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/16/2020 denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner shall tender the $5.00 filing fee to the Clerk of this Court within 30 days from entry of this Order. Failure to pay the filing fee within the time allowed will result in dismissal of the instant action. cc: Petitioner (pro se) (SMJ)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from plaintiff Robert D. Smith. (SMJ)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SMJ)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert D. Smith, by Robert D. Smith. (SMJ)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Robert D. Smith. (SMJ)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Robert D. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibits, #3 Envelope) (SMJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jessie Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?