McCauley v. Heartland Recreational Vehicles et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Lynne McCauley
Defendant: Lippert Components, Inc., Heartland Recreational Vehicles, Elkhart Tool & Die and Thor Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00452
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
2 Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for John R. Maley to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3152314. by Defendant Lippert Components, Inc. (Glenn, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2020: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (DJT).
July 29, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to John R. Maley re #18 Answer to Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/17/2020. (KJA)
July 21, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Lippert Components, Inc. (Glenn, Anthony)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker. The Court strongly encourages all attorneys and their clients to provide substantive speaking opportunities to less experienced attorneys. Newer attorneys often do not have many opportunities to appear and argue in court. Although oral argument is not necessary for ruling on most motions, the Court will hold oral argument if a party (a) requests it in accordance with LR 7.1 (f); and (b) commits to entrusting the argument to an attorney who graduated from law school no more than six years ago. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (MEJ)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker on 7/13/2020. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for hearing and determining all pretrial matters pending before the Court in this action. Further, the Court authorizes Judge Regina S. Edwards to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. Additionally, the Court reminds the parties that they may consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction in this matter at any time in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and LR 73.1. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, CM-RSE (MEJ)
July 8, 2020 NOTICE of email confirmation as to Palmer Vance re #15 Request for Fee Refund (MLG)
July 7, 2020 Filing 15 Request for Fee Refund re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Internet Receipt) by Heartland Recreational Vehicles, Thor Industries, Inc.. (Vance, Palmer)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 7/6/2020. Pursuant to 28 USC 455, the Court concludes that recusal in this case is required. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is reassigned to the docket of Judge Justin R. Walker for all further proceedings and disposition, pursuant to General Order 2019-09. Counsel are instructed to change the civil action number to reflect the initials (JRW) in place and instead of the initials (GNS) on all further pleadings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; Megan Jackson (TJD)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 7/1/2020 - Lippert Components, Inc. shall have up to and including July 21, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (KD)
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Lippert Components, Inc.. (Glenn, Anthony)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE Joinder of Defendant Lippert Components, Inc. in Notice of Removal by Lippert Components, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Glenn, Anthony)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent LCI Industries for Lippert Components, Inc.. and BlackRock, Inc. and The Vanguard Group, Inc. as Other Affiliates by Lippert Components, Inc.. (Glenn, Anthony) Modified to add other affiliates on 6/29/2020 (JWM).
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony K. Glenn on behalf of Lippert Components, Inc. (Glenn, Anthony)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thor Industries, Inc.. (Vance, Palmer)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Thor Industries, Inc.. (Vance, Palmer)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Heartland Recreational Vehicles. identifying Towable Holdings, Inc. and Thor Industries, Inc. as Corporate Parents (Vance, Palmer) Modified to add corporate parents on 6/25/2020 (JWM).
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Heartland Recreational Vehicles. (Vance, Palmer)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Heartland Recreational Vehicles re #1 Notice of Removal, (Vance, Palmer)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL re #1 Notice of Removal from Marion Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 20-CI-115. cc: Counsel; Marion Circuit Court (JWM)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Heartland Recreational Vehicles, Thor Industries, Inc. from Marion Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-115. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-3126693 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (JWM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2020: #3 Cover Sheet) (JWM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCauley v. Heartland Recreational Vehicles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Lynne McCauley
Represented By: Robin C. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lippert Components, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony K. Glenn
Represented By: John R. Maley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Recreational Vehicles
Represented By: Palmer G. Vance, II
Represented By: Nealy R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elkhart Tool & Die
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Palmer G. Vance, II
Represented By: Nealy R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?