Liebert v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kimberlie Liebert
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00486
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/31/2020; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Lindsay. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-CHL. (ARM)
August 27, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/12/2020 granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's responsive pleading is due 8/27/2020. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/12/2020 granting #6 Motion for attorney Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/12/2020 granting #5 Motion for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Amendment to #5 MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3156281. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of William Wahlheim, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Deficiency re #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Reason for Deficiency: Certificate of Good Standing insufficient. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/20/2020. (SMJ)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3156293. by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Braxton S. Thrash, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Thrash, Braxton)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3156281. by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of William Wahlheim, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Wahlheim, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2020: #4 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing (AL Supreme Court)) (SMJ).
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wahlheim, William)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons (es). (SRH)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3137059, filed by Kimberlie Liebert. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons tendered) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liebert v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Braxton S. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberlie Liebert
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?