Ward v. A & A Auto Sales et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Augustus Ward
Defendant: Thompson & Shreve, PLLC and A & A Auto Sales
Case Number: 3:2020cv00499
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 32701
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/10/2020 - The instant motion (DN #4 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff shall within 30 days of entry of this Order either pay the $400 filing fee or file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit form. cc: Plaintiff (KD)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 ERROR: DOCKETED IN ERROR BY CLERK. Modified on 7/16/2020 (SRH).
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A & A Auto Sales, Thompson & Shreve, PLLC, filed by Timothy Augustus Ward. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Rental payments, #2 Exhibit B- Bill of Sale, #3 Summons tendered, #4 Summons tendered). (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. A & A Auto Sales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson & Shreve, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & A Auto Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Augustus Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?