Thompson v. Oldham County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Gary Thompson
Defendant: Oldham County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2020cv00503
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 9/4/2020 - Plaintiff shall within 30 days of entry of this Order file an amended complaint on the 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form and prepare a summons for each Defendant. Plaintiff shall within 30 days of entry of this Order either pay the $400 filing fee or file a prisoner application to proceed without prepayment of fees along with a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form, three summons forms, and a prisoner application to proceed without prepayment of fees with the instant case number affixed to each and the word "Amended" also affixed to the complaint form. Plaintiff is WARNED that his failure to comply fully with this Order within the time allotted will result in DISMISSAL of the instant action for failure to comply with an Order of this Court. cc: Plaintiff, pro se (KD)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: Forms, summons, application to proceed without prepayment of fees, prison trust account statement. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/17/2020. (SRH)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oldham County Detention Center, filed by Gary Thompson. (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Oldham County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oldham County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?