Valley Station Shopping Center, LLC v. Motorists Mutual Insurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Valley Station Shopping Center, LLC
Defendant: Motorists Mutual Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00505
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motorists Mutual Insurance Company, Inc.. (Kuebbing, Alexander)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Motorists Mutual Insurance Company, Inc.. (Kuebbing, Alexander)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valley Station Shopping Center, LLC. Motorists Mutual Insurance Company, Inc. served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail Return Receipt) (Scott, Clinton)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Motorists Mutual Insurance Company, Inc., filed by Valley Station Shopping Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy) (Scott, Clinton)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/20/2020 re #1 Complaint. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff make a suitable curative filing, see 28 U.S.C. 1653, within ten (10) days from the date of entry of this order. If the Court determines that it does not have subject matter jurisdiction this action shall be dismissed without prejudice. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Motorists Mutual Insurance Company, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (DLW)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (DLW)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Motorists Mutual Insurance Company, Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3142301, filed by Valley Station Shopping Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Copy of Policy, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Tendered) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valley Station Shopping Center, LLC v. Motorists Mutual Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Station Shopping Center, LLC
Represented By: Clinton H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorists Mutual Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander J. Kuebbing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?