Glenview Pointe Investment Company, LLC v. The Hanover American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Glenview Pointe Investment Company, LLC
Defendant: The Hanover American Insurance Company and National Trust Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00507
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to The Hanover American Insurance Company COMPLETED on 9/4/2020. Secretary of State return states 8/17/2020. (SMJ)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against National Trust Insurance Company, The Hanover American Insurance Company, filed by Glenview Pointe Investment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Hanover Policy, #2 Exhibit B- National Trust Policy) (Scott, Clinton)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/21/2020. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff make a suitable curative filing, see 28 U.S.C. 1653, within ten (10) days from the date of entry of this order. If the Court determines that it does not have subject matter jurisdiction this action shall be dismissed without prejudice. cc: Counsel (MNM)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to National Trust Insurance Company and The Hanover American Insurance Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to National Trust Insurance Company) (DLW)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (DLW)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Trust Insurance Company and The Hanover American Insurance Company. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3143033, filed by Glenview Pointe Investment Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Hanover Policy, #2 Exhibit B - National Trust Policy, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Tendered - The Hanover American Insurance Company, #5 Summons Tendered - National Trust Insurance Company) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenview Pointe Investment Company, LLC v. The Hanover American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hanover American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Trust Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenview Pointe Investment Company, LLC
Represented By: Clinton H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?