Frieszell v. Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Michael Frieszell
Defendant: Department of Corrections, Roederer Correctional Complex Medical Staff and Roederer Correctional Complex
Case Number: 3:2020cv00509
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Legal Relief of Sentance, and MOTION to Award (1) Million Dollars in Damages and (1) Million in Punitive Damages, by Plaintiff Michael Frieszell. (SMJ)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/28/20. Within 30 days from the entry date of this Memorandum and Order, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form with the words Amended Complaint and the instant case number written in the caption. The Clerk of Court shall also send Plaintiff four blank summons forms with the instant case number. cc: Plaintiff (pro se) with complaint form and summons forms, Defendants (SRH)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE (EBOC) by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/14/2020 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Roederer Correctional Complex is required to send to the Clerk of the Court the initial partial filing fee and thereafter payments from the plaintiff's prison trust account. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to open an account for the payment of the filing fee in this action. cc: Plaintiff (pro se), KYWD-Finance, RCC-Inmate Accts. (SMJ)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Frieszell, by Michael Frieszell. (SMJ)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: Prison Trust Account Statement not provided. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/19/2020. (DLW)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (DLW)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael Frieszell. (DLW)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Corrections, Roederer Correctional Complex, and Roederer Correctional Complex Medical Staff, filed by Michael Frieszell. (Attachments: #1 Summons Tendered) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frieszell v. Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roederer Correctional Complex Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roederer Correctional Complex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Frieszell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?