Rainey v. Whelan
Plaintiff: Rico Rayshon Rainey
Defendant: Whelan
Case Number: 3:2020cv00511
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE (EBOC) Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/24/2020 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), however, Plaintiff is required to pay the $350.00 statutory filing fee under an installment plan. (See Order for specifics.) cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Finance; LMDC, Attn. Inmate Accts. #155823 (CDF)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Rico Rainey. (SMJ)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rico Rayshon Rainey. (SMJ)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: Prison Trust Account Statement not provided. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/20/2020. (DLW)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (DLW)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rico Rayshon Rainey. (DLW)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Whelan, filed by Rico Rayshon Rainey. (Attachments: #1 Summons Tendered) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rainey v. Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rico Rayshon Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?