Gribbins v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Melissa Gribbins
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00527
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
2 Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 eb
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/23/2020; Dismissing Case. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and STRICKEN from the ACTIVE DOCKET. The parties SHALL tender a stipulation of dismissal, signed by all parties who have appeared and dismissing this case with prejudice, within forty-five (45) days from the date of entry of this Order. cc: Counsel (ALS)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT NOTICE of Settlement by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Sauer, Edmund)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/10/2020; Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. cc: Counsel (ALS)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/10/2020. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for purposes of: 1) resolving all non-dispositive pretrial motions; 2) generally managing discovery, including resolving all discovery disputes and conducting any hearing(s) other than the pretrial conference; 3) generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, including altering any dates and/or deadlines, except deadlines for dispositive/Daubert motions, and the pretrial conference and the trial deadlines; 4) conducting a mid-discovery telephonic conference; and 5) conducting a settlement conference, if requested by the parties. This Order SUPERSEDES the prior referral order 5 . This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (RLK) Modified on 9/10/2020: corrected MJ (RLK).
September 10, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 9 Order. ERROR: Incorrect Magistrate Judge referral in docket text. CORRECTION: Docket text corrected to reflect referral to Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, not Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. (RLK)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to the reassignment protocol set forth in GO 20-16, this matter is reassigned to the docket of Judge Claria H. Boom for all further proceedings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (ALS)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Sauer, Edmund)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker. The Court strongly encourages all attorneys and their clients to provide substantive speaking opportunities to less experienced attorneys. Newer attorneys often do not have many opportunities to appear and argue in court. Although oral argument is not necessary for ruling on most motions, the Court will hold oral argument if a party (a) requests it in accordance with LR 7.1 (f); and (b) commits to entrusting the argument to an attorney who graduated from law school no more than six years ago. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (MEJ)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for hearing and determining all pretrial matters pending before the Court in this action. Further, the Court authorizes Judge Colin H. Lindsay to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. Additionally, the Court reminds the parties that they may consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction in this matter at any time in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and LR 73.1. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel, CM/Law Clerk-Lindsay (MEJ)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Marion Circuit Court (DLW)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DLW)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (DLW)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company from Marion Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00128. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-3148725). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service Papers, #2 Exhibit B - Tom Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Letter, #4 Cover Sheet) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gribbins v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Gribbins
Represented By: Timothy Elijah Geertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edmund S. Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?