Fackler et al v. Greenland Acquisition Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edward Hobbs, Stephen Hager and Larry Fackler
Defendant: Nucor Corporation and Greenland Acquisition Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00539
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Defendant Nucor Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint in Case No. 20-CI-0001 (Meade Circuit), #3 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs Response to Discovery Requests in Case No. 20-CI-0001 (Meade Circuit), #4 Exhibit 3 - Mar. 30, 2020 Order of Dismissal in Case No. 20-CI-0001 (Meade Circuit), #5 Exhibit 4 - June 1, 2020 Order Denying R. 59.05 Motion in Case No. 20-CI-0001 (Meade Circuit), #6 Exhibit 5 - Order Denying Motion for Interlocutory Relief in Case No. 2020-CA-0534, #7 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Howard, Lindsey)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Greenland Acquisition Company, Inc. (KD)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AGREED ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 8/27/2020, granting #4 - Defendants have until September 21, 2020 to file their response to Plaintiffs' Complaint in this action. (KD)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Agreed Order of Extension by Nucor Corporation. (Howard, Lindsey)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Greenland Acquisition Company, Inc., Nucor Corporation. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). **ATTESTED COPIES EMAILED TO COUNSEL THIS DATE** (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Greenland Acquisition) (DJT)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Greenland Acquisition Company, Inc., Nucor Corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3152369, filed by Edward Hobbs, Larry Fackler, Stephen Hager. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 grain contract, #3 Exhibit 2 - Lease, #4 Exhibit 3 - Sett Agreement, #5 Exhibit 4 - Lease Termination, #6 Exhibit 5 - Nucor acknowledgement) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fackler et al v. Greenland Acquisition Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Hobbs
Represented By: Michael C. Merrick
Represented By: Clark C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Hager
Represented By: Michael C. Merrick
Represented By: Clark C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Fackler
Represented By: Michael C. Merrick
Represented By: Clark C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nucor Corporation
Represented By: Douglas C. Ballantine
Represented By: Lindsey L. Howard
Represented By: Christopher E. Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenland Acquisition Company, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas C. Ballantine
Represented By: Lindsey L. Howard
Represented By: Christopher E. Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?