United States of America v. Braden
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ashley M. Braden
Not Classified By Court: Warning Order Attorney
Case Number: 3:2020cv00563
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY REPORT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter to Ashley M. Braden - 360 Circle Dr, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter to Ashley M. Braden - 279 Tennessee Ct) by Warning Order Attorney. (Moad, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WARNING ORDER AND ORDER APPOINTING WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/20/2020 granting #5 Warning Order. Attorney Jeffrey S. Moad for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for ASHLEY M. BRADEN by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Issuance, #2 Proposed Order) (Campbell, William)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (SRH)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ashley M. Braden, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B- Real Estate Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C- Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Cover Sheet) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley M. Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Warning Order Attorney
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Moad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?