Westfield Insurance Company v. J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance Company
Defendant: J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00565
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Harrison, Lucas)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Smith, Tracey)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 9/22/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Westfield Insurance Company. (Harrison, Lucas)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Westfield Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Remand, #2 Exhibit A - Interchange Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Lease Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - Complaint for Damages, #5 Exhibit D - Commercial Package Policy, #6 Proposed Order) (Harrison, Lucas)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Smith, Tracey)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/31/2020; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Lindsay. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-CHL. (ARM)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/31/2020 granting #6 Motion for Attorney Christy Comstock to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Christina Comstock to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3172261. by Defendant J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement Cert of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Smith, Tracey)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Smith, Tracey)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: counsel of record/ Jefferson County Circuit Court (SRH)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc., Other Affiliate JBHT for J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (SRH)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-003998. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-3160668). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State court record, #2 Cover Sheet) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westfield Insurance Company v. J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Lucas R. Harrison
Represented By: John William Walters
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Tracey Clemmons Smith
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?