Murray v. Mesilla Valley Transportation et al
Plaintiff: Stephen J. Murray
Defendant: TY K. Jackson and Mesilla Valley Transportation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00575
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 10/14/2020: This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and STRICKEN from the ACTIVE DOCKET, with leave to reinstate within forty-five (45) days if the settlement is not consummated. The parties may tender a supplemental order of dismissal with prejudice if they so desire. cc: counsel (JM)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by TY K. Jackson, Mesilla Valley Transportation (Burnham, Ralph)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING & REPORT (EBOC) by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 9/23/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting)cc: Counsel (RLK)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by TY K. Jackson, Mesilla Valley Transportation. (Burnham, Ralph)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mesilla Valley Transportation. (Burnham, Ralph)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action No. 20-CI-4385. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (ALS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by all Defendants from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-4385 ( Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3163722 ) filed by Mesilla Valley Transportation et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Court Docket, #3 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Mesilla Valley Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TY K. Jackson
Represented By: Ralph E. Burnham
Represented By: James Kelly Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesilla Valley Transportation
Represented By: Ralph E. Burnham
Represented By: James Kelly Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen J. Murray
Represented By: Mark A. Weis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?