Lee v. TRACE3, LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Lee
Defendant: Troy Watson, Elizabeth Harmon and TRACE3, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00585
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Elizabeth Harmon, TRACE3, LLC, Troy Watson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from Case Administrator to J. Bame) (Bame, Jennifer)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff John Lee (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit ex 3 dunn v gordon food services, #4 Exhibit ex 2 nichols v kentucky unemployment, #5 Exhibit ex 3 dixon v allstate) (Astorino, Robert). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 9/22/2020 (SMJ).
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Compel Arbitration by Defendants Elizabeth Harmon, TRACE3, LLC, Troy Watson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss and/or Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Danielle Rodriguez, #3 Exhibit A to Affidavit of D. Rodriguez - Arbitration Agreement, #4 Proposed Order) (Bame, Jennifer). Added MOTION to Compel (Arbitration) on 9/1/2020 (SMJ).
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Escape Velocity Acquisition, Inc. for TRACE3, LLC. by Elizabeth Harmon, TRACE3, LLC, Troy Watson. (Bame, Jennifer)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and/or Compel Arbitration by Elizabeth Harmon, TRACE3, LLC, Troy Watson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Reply) (Bame, Jennifer)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (DLW)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (DLW)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TRACE3, LLC, Troy Watson, and Elizabeth Harmon from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-003862. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-3167297). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summonses, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Troy Watson, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Elizabeth Harmon, #4 Exhibit D - Agreed Order Granting Enlargment of Time, #5 Exhibit E - Motion to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration and Order, #6 Exhibit F - Motion to Vacate, Response, Reply and Order, #7 Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Compel Arbitration, #8 Exhibit H - Defendants' Supp Resp to Motion to Vacate, #9 Exhibit I - Envelope with Opinion and Order, #10 Cover Sheet) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. TRACE3, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Watson
Represented By: Jennifer L. Bame
Represented By: Robert D. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Harmon
Represented By: Jennifer L. Bame
Represented By: Robert D. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACE3, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer L. Bame
Represented By: Robert D. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lee
Represented By: Robert L. Astorino, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew W. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?