Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 502 Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Sadler Mechanical, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mechanical Industry Promotion Fund of Kentucky, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 502 Joint Educational & Training Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Locals 502 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Plumbers, Pipefitters and Service Technicians Local 502, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 502 Health and Welfare Trust Fund and Piping Industry Cooperative of Kentuckiana
Defendant: Sadler Mechanical, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00586
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:0185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plumbers, Pipefitters and Service Technicians Local 502, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 502 Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Locals 502 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Mechanical Industry Promotion Fund of Kentucky, Piping Industry Cooperative of Kentuckiana, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 502 Joint Educational & Training Fund (Johnson, Dennis)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plumbers, Pipefitters and Service Technicians Local 502, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 502 Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Locals 502 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Mechanical Industry Promotion Fund of Kentucky, Piping Industry Cooperative of Kentuckiana, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 502 Joint Educational & Training Fund. Sadler Mechanical, Inc. served on 8/26/2020, answer due 9/16/2020. (Johnson, Dennis)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sadler Mechanical, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (SRH)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance, by Dennis R. Johnson, on behalf of Mechanical Industry Promotion Fund of Kentucky, Piping Industry Cooperative of Kentuckiana, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 502 Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 502 Joint Educational & Training Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Locals 502 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, and Plumbers, Pipefitters and Service Technicians Local 502. (SRH)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mechanical Industry Promotion Fund of Kentucky, Piping Industry Cooperative of Kentuckiana, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 502 Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 502 Joint Educational & Training Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Locals 502 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, and Plumbers, Pipefitters and Service Technicians Local 502. (SRH)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sadler Mechanical, Inc., filed by Plumbers, Pipefitters and Service Technicians Local 502, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 502 Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Locals 502 & 633 Pension Trust Fund, Mechanical Industry Promotion Fund of Kentucky, Piping Industry Cooperative of Kentuckiana, and Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 502 Joint Educational & Training Fund. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3167923. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- NSA, #2 Exhibit 2- CBA, #3 Exhibit 3- Collection Policy/Audit Procedures, #4 Exhibit 4- Pension Fund Trust Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5- Welfare Fund Trust Agreement, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Summons tendered) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 502 Health and Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Sadler Mechanical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sadler Mechanical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mechanical Industry Promotion Fund of Kentucky
Represented By: Dennis R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 502 Joint Educational & Training Fund
Represented By: Dennis R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers and Pipefitters Locals 502 & 633 Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Dennis R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers, Pipefitters and Service Technicians Local 502
Represented By: Dennis R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 502 Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Dennis R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piping Industry Cooperative of Kentuckiana
Represented By: Dennis R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?