Knoop v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Frank R. Knoop, Jr.
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company and Cincinnati Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00589
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Referring Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446bc
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a) Disclosures and Documents by Frank R. Knoop, Jr (Lange, Timothy)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ON JOINT REPORT OF THE PLANNING MEETING OF THE PARTIES and REFERRAL ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 9/24/2020. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 10/16/2020. Expert Discovery due by 12/15/2021. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 9/1/2021. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 10/15/2021. Joinder of Parties/Amended Pleadings due by 4/16/2021. Fact Discovery due by 7/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2022. This matter is hereby REFERRED to Honorable Colin H. Lindsay, United States Magistrate Judge, for full pretrial/non-dispositive matters. cc: counsel, CHL - CM (DLW)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by The Cincinnati Casualty Company. (Inman, James)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER BIFURCATING AND STAYING Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 9/15/2020. Count II asserted by Plaintiff Frank R. Knoop, Jr. against Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Co. is hereby BIFURCATED from Count I. Discovery on the claims asserted in Count II is STAYED pending resolution of the claims asserted in Count I. Defendant Cincinnati Insurance Co.'s pending #5 Motion to Dismiss is WITHDRAWN without prejudice to refiling. cc: Counsel (DLW)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Bad Faith Claims, #7 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Count II, Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery on Count II, Joint MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss without prejudice linking the Joint Motion at Docket No 7 to Docket No 5 filed by Frank R. Knoop, Jr. (Lange, Timothy)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Count II, Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery on Count II, Joint MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss without prejudice by Defendant The Cincinnati Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Inman, James)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Inman, James)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Bad Faith Claims by Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Inman, James)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for The Cincinnati Insurance Company. by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Inman, James)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action No. 20-CI-004511. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (ALS)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Cincinnati Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-004511 (Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3168653) filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint w exh, #3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Summonses, #4 Exhibit 3 - KTCR excerpt) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knoop v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald L. Green
Represented By: James Michael Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Casualty Company
Represented By: Ronald L. Green
Represented By: James Michael Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank R. Knoop, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy D. Lange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?