Johnson v. Evolent Health LLC
Plaintiff: Ericka Peacock Johnson
Defendant: Evolent Health LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00601
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
2 Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441fm
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Evolent Health LLC. (Wyrick, Mitzi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Ericka Peacock Johnson. (Lewis, Abigail)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Michael R. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3203752. by Defendant Evolent Health LLC (Phillips, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/14/2020: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (KD). Modified on 10/14/2020, to separate the proposed order and certificate of good standing from the motion. (KD)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 9/12/2020: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2020 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the telephonic status conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929, access code 2773744. cc: counsel (JM)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 9/11/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Order SUPERSEDES the prior referral order at Docket No. 5 . This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to the reassignment protocol set forth in GO 20-16, this matter is reassigned to the docket of Judge David J. Hale for all further proceedings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Evolent Health LLC. (Wyrick, Mitzi)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker on 8/31/2020. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for hearing and determining all pretrial matters pending before the Court in this action. Further, the Court authorizes Judge Colin H. Lindsay to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. Additionally, the Court reminds the parties that they may consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction in this matter at any time in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and LR 73.1. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, CM/Law Clerk-Lindsay (MEJ)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (DLW)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Evolent Health, Inc., Other Affiliate The Advisory Board Company for Evolent Health LLC. (DLW)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DLW)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Evolent Health LLC from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-004290. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-3170951). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit 3-State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Cover Sheet) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Evolent Health LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ericka Peacock Johnson
Represented By: Garry R. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Abigail V. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evolent Health LLC
Represented By: Mitzi Denise Wyrick
Represented By: Michael R. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?