Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Banks et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: NGL Investment Services, Inc. doing business as NGL Advance Funding, La Nita Banks and Ronisha Banks
Case Number: 3:2020cv00602
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
2 Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ronisha Banks. (KD)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. NGL Investment Services, Inc. waiver sent on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Bengs, Tina)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Ronisha Banks waiver sent on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Bengs, Tina)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 9/9/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Order SUPERSEDES the prior referral order at Docket No. 6 . This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 9/9/2020 granting #9 Motion for Tina M. Bengs to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Tina M. Bengs to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3178655. by Plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tina M. Bengs, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to the reassignment protocol set forth in GO 20-16, this matter is reassigned to the docket of Judge David J. Hale for all further proceedings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: counsel (JM)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. La Nita Banks waiver sent on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Roberts, Kevin)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker on 8/31/2020. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for hearing and determining all pretrial matters pending before the Court in this action. Further, the Court authorizes Judge Colin H. Lindsay to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. Additionally, the Court reminds the parties that they may consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction in this matter at any time in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1) and LR 73.1. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, CM/Law Clerk Lindsay (MEJ)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. No summons tendered. (See Notice for filing instructions.) (DLW)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (DLW)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Roberts on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, (DLW)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DLW)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER against La Nita Banks, Ronisha Banks, and NGL Investment Services, Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3171001, filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Plan Documents, #2 Exhibit B, 1-23-2019 Beneficiary Designation, #3 Exhibit C, LaNita Banks Power of Attorney, #4 Exhibit D, Funeral Home Assignment, #5 Exhibit E, 2-7-2018 Beneficiary Designation, #6 Exhibit F, Death Certificate, #7 Cover Sheet) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Banks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin E. Roberts
Represented By: Tina M. Bengs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NGL Investment Services, Inc. doing business as NGL Advance Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Nita Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronisha Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?