New v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: William New
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00610
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by William New. (White, Alex)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING & REPORT (EBOC) by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 10/2/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting)cc: Counsel (RLK)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Meek, Dustin)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase Bank & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Meek, Dustin)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action No. 20-CI-004538. cc: Counsel; Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (ALS)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-004538. ( Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3173134) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal - State Court, #3 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kristin E. McCall
Represented By: Dustin E. Meek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William New
Represented By: Alex R. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?