Gavi v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gabriel N. Gavi
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00612
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Steinmetz, Robert)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 9/29/2020 granting #8 Motion for Elise Sanguinetti to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #9 Motion Jamie Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Jamie Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3192199. by Plaintiff Gabriel N. Gavi (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) (Weis, Kevin)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Elise Sanguinetti to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3192177. by Plaintiff Gabriel N. Gavi (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit) (Weis, Kevin)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 9/12/2020: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2020 at 9:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the telephonic status conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929, access code 2773744. cc: counsel (JM)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 9/9/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Steinmetz, Robert)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent United Services Automobile Association for USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (DJT)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by USAA Casualty Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-04575. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3174464, filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Jefferson Circuit Court Record) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gavi v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel N. Gavi
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Weis
Represented By: Jamie Goldstein
Represented By: Elise R. Sanguinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Alexander J. Kuebbing
Represented By: Robert L. Steinmetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?