Strategic Marketing Services, LLC v. X10 Teams, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Strategic Marketing Services, LLC
Defendant: Cesar A. Benavides, X10 Teams, LLC and Michael J. Wagner
Case Number: 3:2020cv00619
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Regina S Edwards
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strategic Marketing Services, LLC. (Strause, Randall)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBPC) by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/28/2020: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: counsel (JM)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 10/28/2020. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for purposes of: 1) resolving all non-dispositive pretrial motions; 2) generally managing discovery, including resolving all discovery disputes and conducting any hearing(s) other than the pretrial conference; 3) generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, including altering any dates and/or deadlines, except deadlines for dispositive/Daubert motions, and the pretrial conference and the trial deadlines; 4) conducting a mid-discovery telephonic conference; and 5) conducting a settlement conference, if requested by the parties This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (RLK)
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Counterclaim by Strategic Marketing Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Strause, Randall)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Strategic Marketing Services, LLC by Michael J. Wagner, X10 Teams, LLC, Cesar A. Benavides. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Watson, Lynn)
September 24, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #10 Amended Document, ; Error: filer incorrectly docketed as an amended document; Correction:advised filer of the error, modified the docket text and docketed a separate entry (no document attached) for amended complaint. (KJA)
September 23, 2020 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cesar A. Benavides, Michael J. Wagner, X10 Teams, LLC, filed by Strategic Marketing Services, LLC. (SEE DN #10 FOR FULL VIEWING) (KJA)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Strategic Marketing Services, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4) by Strategic Marketing Services, LLC. (Strause, Randall) Modified on 9/24/2020 to edit docket text (KJA).
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Strategic Marketing Services, LLC. (Strause, Randall) Modified on 9/14/2020 to include - Michael J. Wagner served on 9/5/2020, answer due 9/28/2020, per DN #6 (ALS).
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Strategic Marketing Services, LLC. (Strause, Randall) Modified on 9/14/2020 to include - X10 Teams, LLC served on 9/5/2020, answer due 9/28/2020, per DN #4 (ALS).
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Strategic Marketing Services, LLC. (Strause, Randall) Modified on 9/14/2020 to include - Cesar A. Benavides served on 9/5/2020, answer due 9/28/2020, per DN #5 (ALS).
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Strategic Marketing Services, LLC. Michael J. Wagner served on 9/5/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Strause, Randall)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Strategic Marketing Services, LLC. Cesar A. Benavides served on 9/5/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Strause, Randall)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Strategic Marketing Services, LLC. X10 Teams, LLC served on 9/5/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Strause, Randall)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Cesar A. Benavides, Michael J. Wagner, and X10 Teams, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as Michael J. Wagner, #2 Summons Issued as to X10 Teams, LLC) (DLW)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (DLW)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cesar A. Benavides, Michael J. Wagner, and X10 Teams, LLC. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3176196, filed by Strategic Marketing Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Tendered - Cesar Alejandro Benavides, #7 Summons Tendered - Michael J. Wagner, #8 Summons Tendered - X10 Teams, LLC) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strategic Marketing Services, LLC v. X10 Teams, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar A. Benavides
Represented By: Lynn M. Watson
Represented By: Glenn A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X10 Teams, LLC
Represented By: Lynn M. Watson
Represented By: Glenn A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Wagner
Represented By: Lynn M. Watson
Represented By: Glenn A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strategic Marketing Services, LLC
Represented By: Randall S. Strause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?