Nationwide General Insurance Company v. 1616 Gardiner Lane, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Defendant: 1616 Gardiner Lane, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00651
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT OF RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING (Litigation Plan) by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Thompson, Gary) Modified to edit docket event/text on 11/10/2020 (JWM).
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (EBOC) by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 10/1/2020: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/10/2020. cc: counsel, KL (JM)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 9/29/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; TLB (TJD)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by 1616 Gardiner Lane, Inc.. (DeWees, Robert)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Thompson, Gary) Modified to add corporate parent on 9/17/2020 (JM).
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 1616 Gardiner Lane, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (SRH)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (SRH)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF UMPIRE FOR APPRAISAL, filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company, against 1616 Gardiner Lane, Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3186967. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons tendered) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide General Insurance Company v. 1616 Gardiner Lane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary W. Thompson
Represented By: John William Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1616 Gardiner Lane, Inc.
Represented By: Robert W. DeWees, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?