Armstrong v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Thomas S. Armstrong
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00678
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446mv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT and Agreed Briefing Schedule by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Cassis, Charles)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 11/10/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 1/5/2021 at 9:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 10/23/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Lindsay. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-CHL. (ARM)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Thomas S. Armstrong by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Cassis, Charles) Modified on 10/13/2020, text/parties corrected (SMJ).
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: counsel of record, Jefferson Circuit Court (SRH)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., and Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (SRH)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-004723. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3198083). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State court complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Removal Notice to state court, #3 Cover Sheet) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles H. Cassis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas S. Armstrong
Represented By: Grover S. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?