Louisville Gas and Electric Company v. Isaac W. Bernheim Foundation et al
Plaintiff: Louisville Gas and Electric Company
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service, Isaac W. Bernheim Foundation, East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc. and Kentucky Heritage Land Conservation Fund Board
Case Number: 3:2020cv00688
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand, Motion for Severance of Plaintiff's Claim Against Other Defendants filed by Isaac W. Bernheim Foundation. (Strobo, Randal)
November 25, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand, Motion for Severance of Plaintiff's Claim Against Other Defendants filed by Louisville Gas and Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Petition) (Braun, Monica)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Louisville Gas and Electric Company (Corporate Parents: LG&E and KU Energy LLC; PPL Corporation. Affiliates: Kentucky Utilities Company; LG&E and KU Capital LLC; LG&E and KU Services Company; LG&E and KU Foundation Inc.; DHA, LLC). (Braun, Monica) Modified on 11/25/2020 to add corporate parents and affiliates (DLW).
November 10, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by United States Fish and Wildlife Service. (Bell, Katherine)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO REMAND and for Severance of Plaintiff's Claim Against Other Defendants by Defendant United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Bell, Katherine). Added MOTION FOR SEVERANCE on 11/10/2020 (SRH).
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION Re:PDF re: #5 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Incorrect document attached to original entry. Correct document attached to this entry. (JM)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 10/27/2020 granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The United States shall have an extension to file a responsive pleading up to and including 11/10/2020. cc: Counsel (JM) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/27/2020) (JM).
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response to First Amended Petition by Defendant United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bell, Katherine)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Bullitt Circuit Court (DLW)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (DLW)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Fish and Wildlife Service from Bullitt Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00762. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Order on Motion to Dismiss, #3 Cover Sheet) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisville Gas and Electric Company v. Isaac W. Bernheim Foundation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac W. Bernheim Foundation
Represented By: Clay A. Barkley
Represented By: Randal A. Strobo
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: David T. Royse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Heritage Land Conservation Fund Board
Represented By: Timothy J. Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisville Gas and Electric Company
Represented By: Mary Ellen Wimberly
Represented By: Mark T. Hurst
Represented By: Steven B. Loy
Represented By: Monica Hobson Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?