Hall v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Crystal Hall
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00693
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 eb
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 11/19/2020 - Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the telephonic status conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929, access code 2773744. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. (KD)
November 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.. (Mathisen, Eric)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 10/27/2020 granting #7 Motion for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 10/21/2020, granting #6 - Defendant is granted an extension of time to and including November 17, 2020 in which to file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 10/16/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3205609. by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric P. Mathisen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal, (DJT)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.. (DJT)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Roberts on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (DJT)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-05405. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3203236, filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, state court documents, #3 Exhibit B, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to be filed in the state court) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Kevin E. Roberts
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Hall
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?