Hornback et al v. Czartorski et al
Plaintiff: Sonya Hornback, Alex Hornback and Kevin Hornback
Defendant: Thomas Czartorski, John Doe Troopers 1-2, John Doe Sergeant 3, Cameron Wright, A. Scott Brown and Kevin Dreisbach
Case Number: 3:2020cv00703
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Alex Hornback, Kevin Hornback, Sonya Hornback. (Wiest, Christopher)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alex Hornback, Kevin Hornback, Sonya Hornback. Cameron Wright served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (Wiest, Christopher)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alex Hornback, Kevin Hornback, Sonya Hornback. Kevin Dreisbach served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (Wiest, Christopher)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alex Hornback, Kevin Hornback, Sonya Hornback. A. Scott Brown served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (Wiest, Christopher)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by A. Scott Brown, Thomas Czartorski, Kevin Dreisbach, Cameron Wright. (Combs, Brenn)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 11/13/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties may connect to the telephonic Rule 16 case-management conference by dialing the toll-free meeting number 1- 877-848-7030 and entering access code 7238577# when prompted. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 11/13/2020. Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion For A Short Early Deposition, (DN #7 ), is DENIED without prejudice. The Parties shall not file any further motions pertaining to unresolved discovery and scheduling disputes without first having a joint telephonic conference with the undersigned Magistrate Judge. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summonses Issued as to A. Scott Brown, Kevin Dreisbach, and Cameron Wright. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Dreisbach, #2 Summons - Wright) (SMJ)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE (Praecipe for issuance of Summons) by Alex Hornback, Kevin Hornback, Sonya Hornback (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons for 3 new Defendants) (Wiest, Christopher)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury demand against Thomas Czartorski, Cameron Wright, Kevin Dreisbach, A. Scott Brown, filed by Sonya Hornback, Kevin Hornback, Alex Hornback. (Wiest, Christopher)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 11/9/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny L. King for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge King is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge King. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-LLK. (ARM)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Emergency MOTION for Discovery (for early limited deposition under FRCP 30(a)(2)) by Plaintiffs Alex Hornback, Kevin Hornback, Sonya Hornback (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Wiest, Christopher)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Thomas Czartorski. (Combs, Brenn)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 4 Return of Service. Error: incorrect event used; Correction: attorney has already re-filed using proper event. See DN #5 for viewing. (SMJ)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonya Hornback, Kevin Hornback, Alex Hornback. Thomas Czartorski served on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. (Wiest, Christopher)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ERROR: duplicate efiling. This entry has been removed. See DN #5 . Modified on 11/4/2020 (SMJ).
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Thomas Czartorski and Hon. Daniel Cameron. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. (SRH)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, WITH JURY DEMAND ENDORSED HEREON, filed by Kevin Hornback, Sonya Hornback, and Alex Hornback, against Thomas Czartorski, John Doe Troopers 1-2, and John Doe Sergeant 3. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3207212. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons tendered) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hornback et al v. Czartorski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Hornback
Represented By: Christopher D. Wiest
Represented By: Thomas B. Bruns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Hornback
Represented By: Christopher D. Wiest
Represented By: Thomas B. Bruns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hornback
Represented By: Christopher D. Wiest
Represented By: Thomas B. Bruns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Czartorski
Represented By: Brenn Oliver Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Troopers 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Sergeant 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Wright
Represented By: Brenn Oliver Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Scott Brown
Represented By: Brenn Oliver Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Dreisbach
Represented By: Brenn Oliver Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?