Ethridge v. Salter Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Clarence Samuel Ethridge
Defendant: Salter Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00724
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Salter Labs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Discovery Responses to Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff WC Depo Transcript, #3 Exhibit Salter Labs Letter to Plaintiff July 2019, #4 Exhibit Salter Labs Letter to Plaintiff September 2019, #5 Exhibit 2011 WL 63612, #6 Proposed Order Sustaining MSJ) (Maines, Susan)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 12/7/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 11/23/2020; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Lindsay. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel.CM-CHL. (ARM)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (DJT)
October 29, 2020 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Salter Labs, Inc.. (DJT)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent SunMed Group Holdings, LLC for Salter Labs, Inc.. (DJT)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by Salter Labs, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-003936. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-3216023, filed by Salter Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit RFAs, #4 Exhibit Response to RFAs, #5 Exhibit Discovery Requests, #6 Exhibit Order Deeming RFAs Admitted, #7 Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court, #8 Exhibit State Court Filings) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ethridge v. Salter Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Samuel Ethridge
Represented By: Grover S. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salter Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Susan L. Maines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?