United States of America v. Five Thousand Nine Hundred Dollars in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Five Thousand Nine Hundred Dollars in United States Currency and $5,900 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 3:2020cv00729
Filed: October 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 5/14/2021 granting #9 Motion for Default Judgment. cc: Counsel (SRH)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment and Final Order of Forfeiture by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Default Judgment, #2 Proposed Order Default Judgment and Final Decree of Forfeiture) (Sullivan, Amy) Modified docket text on 4/14/2021 (SRH).
March 31, 2021 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT (EBOC) as to $5,900 in U.S. Currency by $5,900 in U.S. Currency.cc: Merttay Robertson, Jr. (DJT)
March 19, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Order Entry of Default) (Sullivan, Amy)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Publication) (Sullivan, Amy)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Notice of Forfeiture Action) (Sullivan, Amy)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM AND NOTICE by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 12/14/20. cc: USA (AMS)- certified copy with certified copy of Complaint. (SRH)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Process Receipt and Return) (Sullivan, Amy)
October 30, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (MNM)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against Five Thousand Nine Hundred Dollars in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Warrant of Arrest In Rem and Notice) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Five Thousand Nine Hundred Dollars in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Thousand Nine Hundred Dollars in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,900 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Amy M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?