Louisville Galleria, LLC et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Louisville Galleria, LLC, Louisville Galleria Garage, LLC, The Cordish Companies, Inc, Cordish Operating Ventures, LLC and Louisville Galleria Services, LLC
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00733
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Cordish Operating Ventures, LLC, Louisville Galleria Garage, LLC, Louisville Galleria Services, LLC, Louisville Galleria, LLC, The Cordish Companies, Inc. (Schaefer, Justin)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 12/2/2020; Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2021 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing the toll- free number 1-877-848-7030 and entering access code 7238577#. cc: Counsel (ALS)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 11/25/2020. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Lanny King for purposes of: 1) resolving all non-dispositive pretrial motions; 2) generally managing discovery, including resolving all discovery disputes and conducting any hearing(s) other than the pretrial conference; 3) generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, including altering any dates and/or deadlines, except deadlines for dispositive/Daubert motions, and the pretrial conference and the trial deadlines; 4) conducting a mid-discovery telephonic conference; and 5) conducting a settlement conference, if requested by the parties. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (RLK)
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Miller, Barry)
November 24, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Policy) (Miller, Barry)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louisville Galleria, LLC, Louisville Galleria Services, LLC, Louisville Galleria Garage, LLC, The Cordish Companies, Inc, Cordish Operating Ventures, LLC. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company served on 11/6/2020, answer due 11/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt) (Schaefer, Justin)
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher N. Jacovitch on behalf of Cordish Operating Ventures, LLC, Louisville Galleria Garage, LLC, Louisville Galleria Services, LLC, Louisville Galleria, LLC, The Cordish Companies, Inc (Jacovitch, Christopher)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Maloney on behalf of Cordish Operating Ventures, LLC, Louisville Galleria Garage, LLC, Louisville Galleria Services, LLC, Louisville Galleria, LLC, The Cordish Companies, Inc (Maloney, Michael)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Schaefer on behalf of Cordish Operating Ventures, LLC, Louisville Galleria Garage, LLC, Louisville Galleria Services, LLC, Louisville Galleria, LLC, The Cordish Companies, Inc (Schaefer, Justin)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (ALS)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (ALS)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cordish Companies, Inc. (ALS)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3218268) filed by Louisville Galleria, LLC, Louisville Galleria Services, LLC, Louisville Galleria Garage, LLC, The Cordish Companies, Inc, Cordish Operating Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -2017-01-23 Complaint.pdf, #2 Exhibit B - 2018-02-27 Third-Party Complaint.pdf, #3 Exhibit C - Policy.pdf, #4 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisville Galleria, LLC et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisville Galleria, LLC
Represented By: Justin M. Schaefer
Represented By: Michael S. Maloney
Represented By: Christopher N. Jacovitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisville Galleria Garage, LLC
Represented By: Justin M. Schaefer
Represented By: Michael S. Maloney
Represented By: Christopher N. Jacovitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cordish Companies, Inc
Represented By: Justin M. Schaefer
Represented By: Michael S. Maloney
Represented By: Christopher N. Jacovitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cordish Operating Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Justin M. Schaefer
Represented By: Michael S. Maloney
Represented By: Christopher N. Jacovitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisville Galleria Services, LLC
Represented By: Justin M. Schaefer
Represented By: Michael S. Maloney
Represented By: Christopher N. Jacovitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Barry M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?