Zeller v. ASICS America Corporation
Plaintiff: Trisha Zeller
Defendant: ASICS America Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00741
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trisha Zeller. (Spalding, John)
December 31, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Trisha Zeller. (Spalding, John)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 12/10/2020. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 2/1/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 12/10/2020; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-RSE. (ARM)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ASICS America Corporation. (Sword, Brandon)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ASICS America Corporation. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (SRH)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Trisha Zeller, against ASICS America Corporation. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3220698. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons tendered) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeller v. ASICS America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trisha Zeller
Represented By: John K. Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASICS America Corporation
Represented By: Brandon Sword
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?