Farhat v. Unknown Driver et al
Plaintiff: Hasan Farhat
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Old Repuublic Insurance Company, Acuity and Unknown Driver
Case Number: 3:2020cv00744
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Old Repuublic Insurance Company. (Zahniser, David)
December 2, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Snead, Christopher)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 11/10/2020 - Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the telephonic status conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929, access code 2887606. (KD)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 11/9/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Acuity. (Uhl, Judd)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Old Republic Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Great West Casualty Company, Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation, by Old Repuublic Insurance Company. (Zahniser, David) Modified on 11/9/2020, affiliates/text added (SMJ).
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Old Repuublic Insurance Company. (Zahniser, David)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal, (DJT)
November 5, 2020 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Filed in Jefferson Circuit Court -- See DN #1 -4) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (DJT)
November 5, 2020 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Filed in Jefferson Circuit Court - See DN #1 -3) by Acuity. (DJT)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWERS FILED] by Old Repuublic Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-005522. Filing fee $ 400 ; receipt number 0644-3221313, filed by Old Repuublic Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farhat v. Unknown Driver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Curtis Lee Sitlinger
Represented By: Christopher D. Snead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Repuublic Insurance Company
Represented By: David W. Zahniser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acuity
Represented By: R. Morgan Salisbury
Represented By: Judd R. Uhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Driver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hasan Farhat
Represented By: James E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?