Ernspiker v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Michael Ernspiker
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00745
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Kathleen Jones Goldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3253999. by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Kathleen Goldman, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Oehler, Kathiejane)
December 29, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Brandon Peck to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3253966. by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Brandon Peck, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Oehler, Kathiejane)
December 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency as to Brandon M. Peck re #8 Answer to Complaint;Reason for Deficiency: No admission or pro hac vice motion filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/14/2021. (MLG)
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Deficiency as to Kathleen J. Goldman re #8 Answer to Complaint;Reason for Deficiency: No admission or pro hac vice motion filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/11/2021. (MLG)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 12/18/2020; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Lindsay. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel,CM-CHL. (ARM)
December 11, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Oehler, Kathiejane)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying corporate parent Norfolk Southern Corporation, by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Oehler, Kathiejane) Modified on 12/14/2020, party added (SMJ).
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathiejane Oehler on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Oehler, Kathiejane)
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Ernspiker. Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer C. Smith on behalf of Michael Ernspiker (Smith, Jennifer)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (SRH)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, filed by Michael Ernspiker, against Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3222069. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons tendered) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ernspiker v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Kathleen Jones Goldman
Represented By: Kathiejane Oehler
Represented By: Brandon M. Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ernspiker
Represented By: Andrew Dutkanych, III
Represented By: Jennifer C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?