Winebrenner Capital Management LLC v. Kraesig
Plaintiff: Winebrenner Capital Management LLC
Defendant: Clifford Kraesig
Case Number: 3:2020cv00772
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 02:138
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 1/7/2021: This action stands DISMISSED without prejudice and is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. cc: Counsel (DLW)
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Winebrenner Capital Management LLC (Bame, Jennifer)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 1/4/2021: Within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Order, the plaintiff shall file a report advising the Court of the status of this case. cc: Counsel (DLW)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Winebrenner Capital Management LLC. Clifford Kraesig served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. (Bame, Jennifer)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Winebrenner Capital Management LLC. (Bame, Jennifer)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Clifford Kraesig. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clifford Kraesig Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3228508., filed by Winebrenner Capital Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 12-27-19 Non Compete Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - 2-28-20 Non Compete Agreement) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winebrenner Capital Management LLC v. Kraesig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winebrenner Capital Management LLC
Represented By: Jennifer L. Bame
Represented By: Mekesha H. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Kraesig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?