Floyd v. OptumRx Inc.
Plaintiff: Sonya Floyd
Defendant: OptumRx Inc. doing business as OptumRx Specialty Pharmacy
Case Number: 3:2020cv00817
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 fm
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 1/5/2021. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant in the above-styled lawsuit, Case No. 3:20-817-RGJ, are dismissed, with each party to pay their own costs. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sonya Floyd (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL) (Shrewsbury, Marilyn)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 12/22/2020; Granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have an extension up to and including 1/4/2021, to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to the Plaintiffs' Complaint. cc: Counsel (ALS)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant OptumRx Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pryor, Patricia)
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, civil action no. 20-CI-006337. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group, Inc. for OptumRx Inc.. (ALS)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OptumRx Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-006337 (Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 0644-3240017) filed by OptumRx Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 StateCourtPleadings, #3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floyd v. OptumRx Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx Inc. doing business as OptumRx Specialty Pharmacy
Represented By: Patricia M. Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Floyd
Represented By: Marilyn Linsey Shrewsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?