Calhoun v. Louisville Metro Government et al
Plaintiff: Cecil Calhoun
Defendant: Louisville Metro Government, United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, Kentucky Commission on Human Rights, Louisville Metro Authority and Louisville Legal Aid Society
Case Number: 3:2020cv00857
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Regina S Edwards
2 Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF FILING by Cecil Calhoun (JM)
February 3, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF TENDERED SUBPOENA by Cecil Calhoun (JM)
February 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING various letters/docs by Cecil Calhoun (Attachments: #1 Copy of letter to the Kentucky Commission of Human Rights, #2 Copy of letter to Stuart Pope, Legal Aid Attorney, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (JM)
January 29, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing by Cecil Calhoun (JM)
January 28, 2021 Filing 13 Letter from Plaintiff Cecil Calhoun. (JM)
January 27, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Louisville Legal Aid Society (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B - Time Entries, #4 Proposed Order) (Evans, Nicholas)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Judge Benjamin Beaton on 1/27/2021. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge Edwards may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (KD)
January 26, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ekman, Michael)
January 21, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Hearing by Plaintiff Cecil Calhoun (JM)
January 21, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Plaintiff Cecil Calhoun. (JM)
January 21, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Kentucky Commission on Human Rights (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Exhibit 1-State Court Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 2-State Court Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice) (Sells, Colt)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint by Defendant United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ekman, Michael)
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits, by plaintiff Cecil Calhoun. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 3, #2 Part 3 of 3) (SMJ)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 1/20/2021. District Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings RECUSES from this matter and the action is reassigned to the docket of District Judge Benjamin J. Beaton, United States District Court Judge, for all further proceedings. Counsel are requested to change the Civil action number to reflect the initials BJB on all further pleadings. cc: Counsel, BB-CM (SMJ)
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1 / #2 / #3 . Mail sent to Cecil Calhoun. (SMJ)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal.cc: counsel of record, Jefferson Circuit Court Clerk (SRH)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-04496. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Amended Complaint, #2 Cover Sheet) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calhoun v. Louisville Metro Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville Metro Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: Michael D. Ekman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Commission on Human Rights
Represented By: Colt C. Sells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville Metro Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville Legal Aid Society
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Represented By: Nicholas G. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?