United States of America v. $8,900 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $8,900 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 3:2021cv00002
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/2/2021 granting #8 Motion for Default Judgment. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Default Judgment, #2 Proposed Order Default Judgment and Final Order of Forfeiture) (Sullivan, Amy)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to $8,900 in U.S. Currency. cc: Counsel, JHR (SMJ)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Order Entry of Default) (Sullivan, Amy)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Publication) (Sullivan, Amy)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Notice of Forfeiture Action) (Sullivan, Amy)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM AND NOTICE signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 1/6/2021. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM, against $8,900 in U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Forfeiture Complaint, #2 Warrant of Arrest In Rem and Notice, #3 Cover Sheet) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $8,900 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,900 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Amy M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?