Allied Federation, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division of International Brotherhood of Teamsters v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Allied Federation, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division of International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00013
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 2/1/2021, GRANTING #5 Motion for Edward m. Gleason, Jr., to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Plaintiff. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel(RLK)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Edward M. Gleason, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3271857. by Plaintiff Allied Federation, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division of International Brotherhood of Teamsters (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Suetholz, David)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Edward M. Gleason, Jr. re #1 Complaint,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 2/5/2021. (KJA)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CSX Transportation, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (SRH)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (SRH)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT, filed by Allied Federation, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division of International Brotherhood of Teamsters, against CSX Transportation, Inc. Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3259892. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons tendered) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied Federation, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division of International Brotherhood of Teamsters v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Federation, Brotherhood of Maintenance of Way Employees Division of International Brotherhood of Teamsters
Represented By: David O'Brien Suetholz
Represented By: Edward M. Gleason, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?