Payton v. Kentucky Lottery Corporation
Plaintiff: Joel Payton
Defendant: Kentucky Lottery Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv00049
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 fm Fed. Question: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 8/20/2021. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice with all Parties to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. This matter is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. All dates and deadlines are VACATED. cc: counsel (SRH)
August 11, 2021 Filing 15 Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal by Joel Payton. (Zoppoth, Bradley)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/6/2021. Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 8/2/2021. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 11/1/2021. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 12/15/2021. Fact Discovery due by 4/15/2022. Expert Discovery due by 5/2/2022. Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 7/1/2022. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-888-808-6929, access code 2773744. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REFERENCE ORDER signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Kentucky Lottery Corporation. (West, Jan)
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of First Discovery Requests to Plaintiff by Kentucky Lottery Corporation (West, Jan)
April 6, 2021 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Joel Payton. (Zoppoth, Bradley)
March 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Tyler Stocking on behalf of Joel Payton (Stocking, John)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 3/17/2021. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 9:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-888-808-6929, access code 2773744. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/8/2021; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Lindsay. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel,CM-CHL. (ARM)
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kentucky Lottery Corporation. (West, Jan)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kentucky Lottery Corporation. (West, Jan)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joel Payton. (Zoppoth, Bradley)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kentucky Lottery Corporation. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (ALS)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kentucky Lottery Corporation (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0644-3272377) filed by Joel Payton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Text Messages, #2 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payton v. Kentucky Lottery Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Lottery Corporation
Represented By: Akesha Lee Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Jan M. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Payton
Represented By: Bradley S. Zoppoth
Represented By: John Tyler Stocking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?