Kent v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Angela Kent
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00054
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Beaton on 3/8/2021; Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the Telephonic Status Conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929 and entering access code 2773744. cc: counsel (JM)
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.. (Mathisen, Eric)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 2/4/2021 granting #7 Motion for Attorney Eric Peter Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Signed by Judge Benjamin Beaton on 2/2/2021. In response to Defendant's agreed motion for an extension of time to file its answer, DN #6 , the Court GRANTS the motion and extends the time within which it must file an answer to on or before March 5, 2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (KD)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3275257. by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric P. Mathisen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by Judge Benjamin Beaton 2/1/2021. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge Lindsay may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (KD)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (MNM)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Roberts on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (MNM)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (MNM)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00023 (filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3274236). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Notice Filed in State Court Action, #3 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kent v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Kent
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Kevin E. Roberts
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?