Mattingly v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kevin Mattingly
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00086
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 eb
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Kevin Mattingly. (Thornsbury, Elizabeth)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 3/8/2021. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 5/12/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. To participate in the conference, counsel shall use the following dial in information: 1-888-808-6929, Access Code 2887606. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/8/2021; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-RSE (ARM)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Sauer, Edmund)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: counsel of record, Nelson Circuit Court Clerk (SRH)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (SRH)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company from Nelson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00009. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3284276). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- state court documents, #2 Cover Sheet) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mattingly v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Mattingly
Represented By: M. Austin Mehr
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Thornsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Edmund S. Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?