Comprehensive Pharmacy Services, LLC v. University Medical Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Comprehensive Pharmacy Services, LLC
Defendant: University Medical Center, Inc. doing business as University of Louisville Hospital
Case Number: 3:2021cv00107
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Comprehensive Pharmacy Services, LLC. University Medical Center, Inc. waiver sent on 2/19/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. (Stopher, Edward)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to University Medical Center, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (ALS)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent PPS Holdings, Inc. for Comprehensive Pharmacy Services, LLC. (ALS)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against University Medical Center, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0644-3286411) filed by Comprehensive Pharmacy Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Pharmacy Services Agreement, #3 Exhibit Specialty Pharmacy Services Agreement, #4 Exhibit Announcement of New Director of Pharmacy - Dr. Fink, #5 Exhibit Termination Letter) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comprehensive Pharmacy Services, LLC v. University Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Medical Center, Inc. doing business as University of Louisville Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comprehensive Pharmacy Services, LLC
Represented By: Lisa Haidostian
Represented By: Megan Thibert-Ind
Represented By: Todd P. Greer
Represented By: Charles H. Stopher
Represented By: Edward H. Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?