Cecil et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Cecil and William Cecil
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00117
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 3/25/2021 re #9 Attorney Notice of Deficiency issued to Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley shall SHOW CAUSE within 21 days of the entry of this Order why the Court should not strike him as counsel of record in this case for his failure to seek admission pro hac vice in accordance with LR 83.2. cc: Counsel; Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley (CDF)
March 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel, Melissa Foster Bird, Esq. and Megan Basham Davis, Esq. for Richard B. North, Jr., by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Foster Bird, Melissa) Modified to add text on 3/2/2021 (CDF).
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 2/24/2021; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; TLB (TJD)
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley re #5 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Attorney not admitted to the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/10/2021. (JM)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. re #5 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Attorney not admitted in the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/10/2021. (JM)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 COPY OF AMENDED GENERAL ORDER NO 20-06 entered by the Court. (JM)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JM)
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-00666. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (JM)
February 24, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Kentucky via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/24/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 2/24/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 2/24/2021.]
March 6, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-0666-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from azd on 2/24/2021.]
March 6, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13987533 filed by William Cecil, Jacqueline Cecil. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from azd on 2/24/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cecil et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Cecil
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cecil
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Megan B. Davis
Represented By: Melissa G. Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Megan B. Davis
Represented By: Melissa G. Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?