Phipps v. Magna Seating of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kaula Phipps
Defendant: Magna Seating of America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00126
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Filing 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Magna Seating of America, Inc.. (Foley, Chantell)
March 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Magna Seating of America, Inc. (Logsdon, Todd)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Beaton on 3/4/2021; Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the Telephonic Status Conference by dialing the toll-free number 1-888-808-6929 and entering access code 2773744. cc: counsel (JM)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Magna Seating of America, Inc.. (Foley, Chantell)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Benjamin Beaton. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), the Court REFERS this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge Lindsay may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (KD)
February 25, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Bullitt Circuit Court (MNM)
February 25, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Magna International, Inc. for Magna Seating of America, Inc. (MNM)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (MNM)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Magna Seating of America, Inc. from Bullitt Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00101 (filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3292515). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phipps v. Magna Seating of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magna Seating of America, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Birchfield
Represented By: Chantell C. Foley
Represented By: Todd B. Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaula Phipps
Represented By: Larry D. Ashlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?