Schneider Hotels, LLC et al v. Flood Brothers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Schneider Hotels, LLC and Schneider Ground Company (Hotels) LLC
Defendant: Flood Brothers, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00133
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: David J Hale
2 Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 4/5/2021. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (RLK)
March 11, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flood Brothers, Inc. (Harrison, Miles)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Schneider Ground Company (Hotels) LLC, Schneider Hotels, LLC. (Kaplan, David)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Kaplan on behalf of Schneider Ground Company (Hotels) LLC, Schneider Hotels, LLC (Kaplan, David)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Flood Brothers, Inc. (Harrison, Miles)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 Case Re-Assigned in accordance with GO 2018-01: Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MNM)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 3/3/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Judge Claria Horn Boom RECUSES from this matter, and the action is hereby REASSIGNED to the docket of the Honorable David J. Hale, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. Counsel are requested to change the civil action number to reflect the initials DJH on all further pleadings. cc: Counsel of Record (MNM)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE - re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 21-CI-00778. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (ALS)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Flood Brothers, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit court, case number 21-CI-00778 (Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 0644-3295605) filed by Flood Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schneider Hotels, LLC et al v. Flood Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schneider Hotels, LLC
Represented By: David S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schneider Ground Company (Hotels) LLC
Represented By: David S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flood Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Cory J. Skolnick
Represented By: Miles Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?