Boyle v. United Parcel Service Co. (Air)
Plaintiff: Tim Boyle
Defendant: United Parcel Service Co. (Air)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00135
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by United Parcel Service Co. (Air). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Jones Declaration)) (Kingsley, Meredith)
April 12, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by United Parcel Service Co. (Air). (Kingsley, Meredith)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 4/8/2021, GRANTING #8 Motion for Charles H. Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Defendant. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (ECF Mandatory Notice and Registration Form sent to Morgan with this Text Order.)(RLK)
April 7, 2021 Filing 15 Supplement to #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Defendant United Parcel Service Co. (Air) (Kingsley, Meredith) Modified on 4/8/2021: changed from "Motion to Supplement" to "Supplement" (RLK).
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 4/5/2021 granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. cc: Counsel (SRH)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 3/31/2021, GRANTING #9 Motion for F. Nicholas Chandler to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant United Parcel Service Co. (Air). This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(RLK)
March 30, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Tim Boyle (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Authority in Support of Motion to Remand and for costs, #2 Proposed Order Remanding, #3 Plaintiff's Exhibit C, #4 Addendum Brietiigam v. UPS Service Co., #5 Addendum Shannon v. PNC Bank) (Jannace, Peter)
March 29, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Tim Boyle. (Attachments: #1 Addendum, #2 Proposed Order) (Jannace, Peter)
March 25, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Tim Boyle (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Jannace, Peter)
March 17, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Fredrick N. Chandler to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3306797. by Defendant United Parcel Service Co. (Air) (Kingsley, Meredith) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2021: #1 Proposed Order) (SRH).
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Charles H. Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3306790. by Defendant United Parcel Service Co. (Air) (Kingsley, Meredith) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2021: #1 Proposed Order) (SRH).
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to F. Nicholas Chandler re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/29/2021. (KJA)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Charles H. Morgan re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/29/2021. (KJA)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant United Parcel Service Co. (Air) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit 3 to Memorandum in Support, #5 Exhibit 4 to Memorandum in Support, #6 Proposed Order) (Kingsley, Meredith)
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: counsel of record, Jefferson Circuit Court (SRH)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (SRH)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc. for United Parcel Service Co. (Air). (SRH)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, filed by United Parcel Service Co. (Air), from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-000813. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3295775). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- state court documents, #2 Cover Sheet) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyle v. United Parcel Service Co. (Air)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service Co. (Air)
Represented By: F. Nicholas Chandler
Represented By: Charles H. Morgan
Represented By: Meredith J. Kingsley
Represented By: Amir J. Nahavandi
Represented By: Tony C. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Boyle
Represented By: David O'Brien Suetholz
Represented By: Peter J. Jannace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?