Pierson v. Midwest Investors Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Greg Pierson
Defendant: Midwest Investors Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00146
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 3/11/2021: This case is TRANSFERRED to the Central Division of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky at Frankfort and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. cc: Counsel, KYED-Central Division (DLW)
March 12, 2021 Remark: Case transferred from Kentucky Western has been opened in Eastern District of Kentucky as case 3:21-cv-00010, filed 03/12/2021. (MLG)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/10/2021. District Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings RECUSES from this matter and the action is reassigned to the docket of District Judge David J. Hale for all further proceedings. Counsel are requested to change the Civil action number to reflect the initials DJH on all further pleadings. cc: Counsel, DJH-CM (SMJ)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: counsel of record, Franklin Circuit Court Clerk (SRH)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, filed by Midwest Investors Group, Inc., from Franklin Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00110. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0644-3299589). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- state court record, #3 Cover Sheet) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierson v. Midwest Investors Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Investors Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin L. Chlarson
Represented By: Dennis D. Murrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Pierson
Represented By: James N. O'Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?